VT JRS059 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - As adopted by Senate and House

Summary

Joint resolution supporting the Gettysburg Battlefield Preservation Association’s effort to preserve the Camp Letterman hospital site

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint resolution supporting the Gettysburg Battlefield Preservation Association’s effort to preserve the Camp Letterman hospital site

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11SenateAs adopted by Senate and House
2018-05-11SenateHouse message House adopted in concurrence
2018-05-10HouseAdopted in Concurrence
2018-05-09HouseRead first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52
2018-05-08HouseSenate Message, Adopted in concurrence
2018-05-08SenateAdopted on the part of the Senate
2018-05-08SenateUnfinished Business/Joint Resolutions for Adoption
2018-05-07SenateUnfinished Business/Joint Resolutions for Adoption
2018-05-05SenateNew Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption
2018-05-04SenateRead 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback