VT JRS054 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 5 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-11 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Related To The Payment Of Dairy Hauling Costs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Related To The Payment Of Dairy Hauling Costs

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-11 As adopted by Senate and House
2010-05-11 Committee of Conference report adopted
2010-05-11 Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Giard for Committee, text
2010-05-11 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-11 Committee of Conference Report
2010-05-08 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-08 Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill)
2010-05-08 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-05 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-05 Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Starr, Giard, and Kittell
2010-05-05 House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Kittell
2010-05-05 House proposal of amendment; text
2010-05-05 Speaker appointed Bray of New Haven, Conquest of Newbury and McAllister of Highgate as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2010-05-05 Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-04 Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-03 New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-30 House Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-28 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-04-28 Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2010-04-27 Third Reading Ordered
2010-04-27 Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Agriculture agreed to
2010-04-27 Rep. Ainsworth of Royalton reported for the committee on Agriculture
2010-04-27 Read Second Time
2010-03-24 Read First time, treated as a bill and referred to committee on Agriculture
2010-03-23 Adopted on the part of the Senate
2010-03-23 New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption
2010-03-19 Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback