VT JRS045 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Joint resolution establishing a procedure for the conduct of the election of two legislative trustees of the Vermont State Colleges Corporation by plurality vote by the General Assembly in 2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint resolution establishing a procedure for the conduct of the election of two legislative trustees of the Vermont State Colleges Corporation by plurality vote by the General Assembly in 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-09SenateAs adopted by Senate and House
2018-02-09SenateHouse message House adopted in concurrence
2018-02-07HouseRead and Adopted in Concurrence
2018-02-06SenateAdopted by Senate
2018-02-06SenateNew Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption
2018-02-02SenateRead 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback