VT JRS018 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution in support of combating the rise in hate crimes and bigotry
Title
Joint resolution in support of combating the rise in hate crimes and bigotry
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Cummings [D] | Sen. Brian Campion [D] | Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] | Sen. Mark MacDonald [D] |
Sen. Michael Sirotkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 134, Nays = 7 (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time & adopted on roll call requested by Senator McCormack, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Motion to amend disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 8, Nays = 21 (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time & adopted on roll call requested by Senator McCormack, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Motion to amend disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 8, Nays = 21 (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | House message House adopted in concurrence |
2017-05-02 | House | Adopted in Concurrence |
2017-05-02 | House | Read Third time |
2017-05-01 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 134, Nays = 7 |
2017-05-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-05-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-04-18 | House | Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time & adopted on roll call requested by Senator McCormack, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Motion to amend disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 8, Nays = 21 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Degree moved to amend bill |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senator Degree requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Degree moved to amend bill |
2017-04-13 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-12 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-12 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Judiciary per Rule 51 |