VT JRS017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint resolution rescinding the General Assembly’s request, contained in 2014 Acts and Resolves No. R-454, for Congress to convene a U.S. Constitutional Convention

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint resolution rescinding the General Assembly’s request, contained in 2014 Acts and Resolves No. R-454, for Congress to convene a U.S. Constitutional Convention

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseRead First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Government Operations
2017-04-06SenateRead 3rd time & adopted
2017-04-06SenateDivision 9-20, as requested by Senator Sears
2017-04-06SenateMotion disagreed to
2017-04-06SenatePoint of order sustained by the President
2017-04-06SenatePoint of order raised by Senator(s) Degree
2017-04-06SenateSenator Sears motion to order bill to lie
2017-04-06SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2017-04-05SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-04-04SenateRoll Call, requested by Senator Sears,  Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 7
2017-04-04SenateReported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2017-04-04SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2017-04-04SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-03-31SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2017-03-30SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2017-02-28SenateCommittee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Sears
2017-02-14SenateRead 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Judiciary per Rule 51

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback