VT JRS011 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-08 - House message House adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Joint resolution establishing a procedure for the conduct of the election of UVM trustees by plurality vote by the General Assembly in 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint resolution establishing a procedure for the conduct of the election of UVM trustees by plurality vote by the General Assembly in 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-08SenateHouse message House adopted in concurrence
2019-02-07HouseAdopted in Concurrence
2019-02-05HouseRead first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52
2019-02-01HouseSenate Message, Adopted in concurrence
2019-02-01SenateAdopted on the part of the Senate
2019-02-01SenateNew Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption
2019-01-31SenateRead 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback