VT JRH017 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-04 - Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy per Rule 51
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint resolution opposing the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency’s proposed rollback of federal motor vehicle emission standards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint resolution opposing the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency’s proposed rollback of federal motor vehicle emission standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 128, Nays = 14 (Y: 128 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateRead 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy per Rule 51
2018-05-02HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 128, Nays = 14
2018-05-02HouseRead Third time
2018-05-01HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-05-01HouseReport of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to.
2018-05-01HouseRep. McCormack of Burlington reported for the committee on Energy and Technology
2018-05-01HouseRead Second Time
2018-04-19HouseRead First time, treated as a bill, and referred to committee on Energy and Technology

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback