VT JRH015 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution requesting the Federal Trade Commission, the Federal Communications Commission, and Congress to adopt more effective measures to enforce the federal Do Not Call list and to police illegal robocalls
Title
Joint resolution requesting the Federal Trade Commission, the Federal Communications Commission, and Congress to adopt more effective measures to enforce the federal Do Not Call list and to police illegal robocalls
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | House | Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time & adopted in concurrence |
2018-04-19 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-04-18 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted in Concurrence |
2018-04-03 | House | Read first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2018/J.R.H.15 |
Text | http://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/RESOLUTN/JRH015/JRH015%20As%20Introduced.pdf |