VT JRH004 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 108-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Senate Message, adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 108-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-07 - Senate Message, adopted in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution recognizing March 31, 2023 as Transgender Day of Visibility in Vermont, expressing support for the transgender rights of all Vermonters, and opposing legislation restricting the rights of transgender Vermonters regardless of their age
Title
Joint resolution recognizing March 31, 2023 as Transgender Day of Visibility in Vermont, expressing support for the transgender rights of all Vermonters, and opposing legislation restricting the rights of transgender Vermonters regardless of their age
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | House | Senate Message, adopted in concurrence |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Adopted in concurrence |
2023-04-06 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for adoption in concurrence |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |
2023-03-31 | House | Read and adopted |