VT HR0011 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Read and Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Read and Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House resolution commending the friendly bilateral relations between Taiwan and both the United States and the State of Vermont and supporting Taiwan’s full participation in the international community
Title
House resolution commending the friendly bilateral relations between Taiwan and both the United States and the State of Vermont and supporting Taiwan’s full participation in the international community
Sponsors
Rep. Kathryn Webb [D] | Rep. Janet Ancel [D] | Rep. William Botzow [D] | Rep. Michael Marcotte [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Partridge [D] | Rep. Samuel Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | Read and Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to postpone action until Thursday, February 23, 2017 which was agreed to |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2018/H.R.11 |
Text | http://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/RESOLUTN/HR0011/HR0011%20As%20Introduced.pdf |