VT H0488 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-28 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the State’s Transportation Program and miscellaneous changes to laws related to transportation
Title
An act relating to the State’s Transportation Program and miscellaneous changes to laws related to transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 3 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 3 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | House | Signed by Governor on May 28, 2015 |
2015-05-11 | House | Passed the House and Senate on May 11, 2015 |
2015-05-11 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2015-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2015-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2015-05-07 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2015-05-08 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2015-05-06 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Brennan of Colchester |
2015-04-30 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester moved to postpone action until May 6, 2015 which was agreed to |
2015-04-28 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2015-04-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation, as amended, agreed to |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Finance |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Mazza for Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-23 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed |
2015-03-26 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 3 |
2015-03-26 | House | Read Third time |
2015-03-25 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2015-03-25 | House | Amendment of Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2015-03-25 | House | Rep. Helm of Fair Haven, recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | House | Rep. Masland of Thetford, recommended for the committee on Ways & Means |
2015-03-25 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester spoke for the committee on Transportation |
2015-03-25 | House | Read Second Time |
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2015-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways & Means per Rule 35(a) |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee Bill read first time |