VT H0968 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-11 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-11 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Vermont Coronavirus Economic Stimulus Equity Program
Title
An act relating to the Vermont Coronavirus Economic Stimulus Equity Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-09 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-09-09 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield agreed to |
2020-09-08 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-09-08 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury agreed to |
2020-09-08 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury spoke for the committee on Appropriations |
2020-09-08 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-09-08 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-09-08 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on September 8, 2020 |