VT H0965 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - House message: Governor approved bill on July 2, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - House message: Governor approved bill on July 2, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to health care- and human services-related appropriations from the Coronavirus Relief Fund
Title
An act relating to health care- and human services-related appropriations from the Coronavirus Relief Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Starr, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 145, Nays = 0 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 145, Nays = 0 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on July 2, 2020 |
2020-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor on July 2, 2020 |
2020-06-26 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2020-06-30 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 30, 2020 |
2020-06-26 | House | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney. |
2020-06-26 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2020-06-26 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-26 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Kitchel motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Starr, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations, as amended, agreed to |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations amended as moved by Senator(s) Kitchel |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-17 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-17 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-06-17 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-17 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-06-17 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 145, Nays = 0 |
2020-06-17 | House | Rep. Yacovone of Morristown demanded yeas and nays |
2020-06-17 | House | Rep. Yacovone of Morristown reported for the committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-17 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-06-17 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-17 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on June 17, 2020 |