VT H0954 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to miscellaneous tax provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to miscellaneous tax provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-06-25SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-06-25SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2020-06-25SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Cummings motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2020-06-25SenatePending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Cummings
2020-06-25SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-06-24Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-06-24SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Finance, as amended, agreed to
2020-06-24SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2020-06-24SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Pearson, Balint, Brock, Campion, Cummings, MacDonald, and Sirotkin; text
2020-06-24SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance
2020-06-24SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Cummings
2020-06-24SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2020-06-24SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-06-23SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Cummings
2020-06-23SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2020-06-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-05-26SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2020-05-22HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-05-22HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-05-20HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-05-20HouseRep. Young of Greensboro spoke for the committee on Ways and Means
2020-05-20HouseRead Second Time
2020-05-15HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on 05/15/20

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback