VT H0951 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - New Business/Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the municipal emergency statewide education property tax borrowing program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the municipal emergency statewide education property tax borrowing program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-05-26Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-05-26SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
2020-05-26SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations
2020-05-26SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2020-05-26SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-05-26SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-05-19SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-05-15HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-05-15HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-05-15HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Townsend of South Burlington agreed to
2020-05-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-05-13HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury, Fagan of Rutland City, Helm of Fair Haven, Jessup of Middlesex, Lanpher of Vergennes, Myers of Essex, Toll of Danville, Townsend of South Burlington, and Yacovone of Morristown agreed to
2020-05-13HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington spoke for the committee on Appropriations
2020-05-13HouseRead Second Time
2020-05-11HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on 05/11/2020

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback