VT H0942 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Transportation Program and miscellaneous changes to laws related to transportation
Title
An act relating to the Transportation Program and miscellaneous changes to laws related to transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 147, Nays = 0 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 30, 2020 |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor on June 30, 200 |
2020-06-26 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2020-06-26 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 26, 2020 |
2020-06-25 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2020-06-25 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-24 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Ashe |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-24 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation agreed to |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Transportation |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-05-29 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-05-29 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-05-29 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 147, Nays = 0 |
2020-05-29 | House | Rep. Krowinski of Burlington demanded yeas and nays |
2020-05-27 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-05-27 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. McCormack of Burlington, Murphy of Fairfax, Corcoran of Bennington, Burke of Brattleboro, McCarthy of St. Albans City, McCoy of Poultney, Potter of Clarendon, Quimby of Concord, Savage of Swanton, Sullivan of Burlington, and White of Hartford agreed to |
2020-05-27 | House | Rep. Helm of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2020-05-27 | House | Rep. McCormack of Burlington spoke for the committee on Transportation |
2020-05-27 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/24/2020 |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2020-03-13 | House | Committee Bill read first time |