VT H0940 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
Pending: House Agriculture and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-19 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
Pending: House Agriculture and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to animal cruelty investigation response and training
Title
An act relating to animal cruelty investigation response and training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |
2020-06-03 | House | Action postponed until June 12, 2020 as moved by Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland |
2020-03-24 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on 3/24/2020 |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2020/H.940 |
Text | https://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2020/Docs/BILLS/H-0940/H-0940%20As%20Introduced.pdf |