VT H0920 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-17 - Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the authority of the Agency of Digital Services
Title
An act relating to the authority of the Agency of Digital Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2018-03-21 | House | Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Read Third time |
2018-03-21 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-03-21 | House | Rep. Carr of Brandon moved to amend the bill |
2018-03-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-20 | House | Rep. Dakin of Colchester recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-20 | House | Rep. Carr of Brandon spoke for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2018-03-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 14, 2018 |