VT H0874 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to inmate access to prescription drugs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to inmate access to prescription drugs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
2018-05-21HouseSigned by Governor on May 21, 2018
2018-05-16HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
2018-05-03HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2018-05-03SenateRules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-03SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-05-03SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2018-05-03SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-02SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-05-01SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2018-04-30SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2018-04-27SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
2018-04-26HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Taylor of Colchester
2018-04-19HouseRep. Taylor of Colchester moved to postpone action until April 26, 2018 which was agreed to
2018-04-17HouseRep. Taylor of Colchester moved to postpone action until April 19, 2018 which was agreed to
2018-04-12HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-11SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-11SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-04-10Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-04-10SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions agreed to
2018-04-10SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Rodgers for Committee on Institutions
2018-04-10SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions
2018-04-10SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-04-06SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions
2018-04-06SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-16SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions
2018-03-14HousePassed
2018-03-14HouseRead Third time
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-03-13HouseReport of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to.
2018-03-13HouseRep. Taylor of Colchester reported for the committee on Corrections and Institutions
2018-03-13HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-06HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Corrections and Institutions

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback