VT H0861 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 10, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 10, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to regulation of treated article pesticides
Title
An act relating to regulation of treated article pesticides
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 123, Nays = 16 (Y: 123 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 10, 2016 |
2016-05-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 5/6/16 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2016-04-26 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2016-04-26 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2016-04-21 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Zuckerman for Committee on Agriculture |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2016-04-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2016-03-17 | House | Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 123, Nays = 16 |
2016-03-17 | House | Read Third time |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-03-16 | House | Rep. Rep. Zagar of Barnard spoke for the committee on Agriculture & Forest Products |
2016-03-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/15/16 |
2016-03-11 | House | Committee Bill read first time |