VT H0859 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to requiring municipal corporations to affirmatively vote to retain ownership of lease lands

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to requiring municipal corporations to affirmatively vote to retain ownership of lease lands

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
2018-05-21HouseSigned by Governor on May 21, 2018
2018-05-15HouseBill Requested by Governor, Delivered on May 15, 2018
2018-05-05SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2018-05-03HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-05-03HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-05-03HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-02HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-05-02SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-02SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-05-02SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-05-01Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-05-01SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2018-05-01SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Government Operations
2018-05-01SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2018-05-01SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-04-30SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2018-04-30SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-20SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-15HouseRead Third time and Passed
2018-03-13HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington moved to postpone action until March 15. 2018 which was agreed to
2018-03-02HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-03-02HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
2018-03-02HouseRep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations
2018-03-02HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-02HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback