VT H0856 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous amendments to municipal law
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous amendments to municipal law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Bill Requested by Governor, Delivered on May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-05-01 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-05-01 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-05-01 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-01 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Brock |
2018-04-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Division of the Senate 22-6 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-26 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-15 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-14 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2018-03-14 | House | Rep. Graham of Williamstown asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2018-03-14 | House | Rep. Graham of Williamstown moved to amend the report of the committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-14 | House | Rep. LaClair of Barre Town reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-14 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-03-13 | House | Rep. LaClair of Barre Town moved to postpone action until March 14, 2018 which was agreed to |
2018-02-02 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |