VT H0829 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to appointing town grand jurors

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to appointing town grand jurors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on April 11, 2018
2018-04-11HouseSigned by Governor on April 11, 2018
2018-03-29HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2018-03-28SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2018-03-28SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-27SenateReported favorably by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2018-03-27SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-27SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-23SenateFavorable report by Committee on Government Operations
2018-03-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-02-20SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2018-02-15HouseRead Third time and Passed
2018-02-14HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-02-14HouseRep. LaClair of Barre Town reported for the committee on Government Operations
2018-02-14HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-01HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback