VT H0828 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to disclosures in campaign finance law
Title
An act relating to disclosures in campaign finance law
Sponsors
Rep. John Gannon [D] | Rep. Jessica Brumsted [D] | Rep. Marcia Gardner [D] | Rep. James Harrison [R] |
Rep. Maida Townsend [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Bill Requested by Governor, Delivered on May 10, 2018 |
2018-04-27 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-04-27 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-04-25 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Division of the Senate Yeas 17, Nays 6 |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-23 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-22 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2018-02-22 | House | Rep. Gannon of Wilmington reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-22 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-01 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |