VT H0799 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-09 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to notice of sale of property subject to unpaid property taxes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to notice of sale of property subject to unpaid property taxes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-09SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-07HousePassed
2018-02-07HouseRead Third time
2018-02-07HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-02-07HouseRep. Murphy of Fairfax moved to amend the bill
2018-02-06HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-02-06HouseRep. Burditt of West Rutland spoke for the committee on Judiciary
2018-02-06HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-02HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on February 2, 2018

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback