VT H0788 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-24 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to technical corrections for the 2020 legislative session

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to technical corrections for the 2020 legislative session

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-24SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2020-03-13HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2020-03-13HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-03-13HouseRep. Murphy of Fairfax moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-03-12HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations agreed to.
2020-03-12HouseRep. Palasik of Milton reported for the committee on Government Operations
2020-03-12HouseRead Second Time
2020-01-21HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback