VT H0783 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Rep. Killacky of South Burlington moved that the bill be committed to the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs which was agreed to.
Pending: House General, Housing and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to recovery residences

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to recovery residences

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-25HouseRep. Killacky of South Burlington moved that the bill be committed to the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs which was agreed to.
2020-06-03HouseAction postponed until June 10, 2020 as moved by Rep. Killacky of South Burlington
2020-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar for Notice on 5/18/2020
2020-02-25HouseCommitted to Committee on Human Services by motion of Rep. Killacky of South Burlington
2020-02-25HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Killacky of South Burlington
2020-01-21HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback