VT H0760 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Kitchel, Ashe, McCormack, Nitka, Sears, Starr, and Westman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to fiscal year 2020 budget adjustments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to fiscal year 2020 budget adjustments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Kitchel, Ashe, McCormack, Nitka, Sears, Starr, and Westman
2020-02-14SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Kitchel, Ashe, McCormack, Nitka, Sears, Starr, and Westman; text
2020-02-14SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2020-02-14SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Kitchel, Ashe, McCormack, Nitka, Sears, Starr, and Westman
2020-02-14SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2020-02-13SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2020-02-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-02-12SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
2020-02-11HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Toll of Danville
2020-02-11HouseRep. Toll of Danville moved to concur in the Senate prop of amend with a further amend thereto
2020-02-06HouseAction postponed until February 11, 2020 as moved by Rep. Toll of Danville
2020-02-04HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-01-31SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2020-01-31SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2020-01-31SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Sears, Kitchel, Nitka, Starr, McCormack, Westman, and Ashe motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2020-01-30Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-01-30SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
2020-01-30SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-31SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears, Kitchel, Nitka, Starr, McCormack, Westman, and Ashe
2020-01-31SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-01-30SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-30SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-01-29SenateRule 31 suspended on motion of Sen. Ashe, and bill NOT referred to Finance Committee
2020-01-29SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-28SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-23HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-01-22HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-01-22HouseRep. Toll of Danville spoke for the committee on Appropriations
2020-01-22HouseRead Second Time
2020-01-21HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on 1/21/2020

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback