VT H0745 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the approval of the adoption of the charter of the Town of Montgomery
Title
An act relating to the approval of the adoption of the charter of the Town of Montgomery
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on June 7, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 1, 2022 |
2022-05-10 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2022-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-04 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-05-04 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-05-03 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-05-03 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to |
2022-05-03 | House | Report of the Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Ancel of Calais recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Lefebvre of Orange reported for the Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-03 | House | Read Second time |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-29 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2022-04-26 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-06 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations |