VT H0742 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Milton
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the Town of Milton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 31, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on May 31, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 25, 2022 |
2022-05-10 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2022-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-09 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-04 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-05-04 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-05-03 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-05-03 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell moved to postpone action until later in the orders of the day which was agreed to |
2022-05-03 | House | Read Second time |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-29 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-29 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations |