VT H0729 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 31, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to miscellaneous judiciary procedures
Title
An act relating to miscellaneous judiciary procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 31, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on May 31, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 25, 2022 |
2022-05-10 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-06 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2022-05-06 | House | Which was agreed to |
2022-05-06 | House | Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland moved to amend the House proposal of amendment offered by Rep. Norris of Sheldon |
2022-05-06 | House | Rep. Norris of Sheldon moved to concur in the Senate proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto |
2022-05-06 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2022-05-06 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | House | Rep. Norris of Sheldon moved to postpone action until May 6, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-05-05 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-04 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Ram Hinsdale |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Sears |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) White, Sears, Baruth, and Benning |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ram Hinsdale |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White, Sears, Baruth, and Benning |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Balint and Sears |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Balint, White, Sears, Baruth, and Benning |
2022-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears and Baruth; text |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White; text |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Hardy for Committee on Finance |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears and Baruth |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears and Baruth |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears and Baruth |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears, Baruth, Benning, Nitka, and White |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-24 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-24 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-23 | House | Rep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-23 | House | Rep. Canfield of Fair Haven recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-03-23 | House | Rep. Norris of Sheldon spoke for the Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-23 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-03-22 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-15 | House | Committee bill read first time |