VT H0728 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to bail reform
Title
An act relating to bail reform
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Grad [D] | Rep. Mary Hooper [D] | Rep. Selene Colburn [D] | Rep. Charles Conquest [D] |
Rep. Martin LaLonde [D] | Rep. Ruqaiyah Morris [D] | Rep. Barbara Rachelson [D] | Rep. Janssen Willhoit [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-05-09 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed |
2018-03-02 | House | Read Third time |
2018-03-02 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-03-02 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-02 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2018-03-02 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-30 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |