VT H0728 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to bail reform

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to bail reform

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseSigned by Governor on May 22, 2018
2018-05-16HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
2018-05-09HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-05-09HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-05-09HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-05-08HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-08SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2018-05-08SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-05-07Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-05-07SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-05-07SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-07SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-05-07SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-05SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-05-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-04SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-13SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-02HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-03-02HousePassed
2018-03-02HouseRead Third time
2018-03-02HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2018-03-02HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-03-02HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2018-03-02HouseRep. Colburn of Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-03-02HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-30HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback