VT H0726 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to creating a voluntary pollinator-friendly standard for solar arrays
Title
An act relating to creating a voluntary pollinator-friendly standard for solar arrays
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Sheldon [D] | Rep. Robin Chesnut-Tangerman [D] | Rep. Curtis McCormack [D] | Rep. Joseph Troiano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2018-03-13 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-03-02 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-03-02 | House | Report of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to. |
2018-03-02 | House | Rep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs reported for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2018-03-02 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-08 | House | Rep. Partridge of Windham moved that the committee on Agriculture and Forestry be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Energy and Technology which was agreed to. |
2018-01-30 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry |