VT H0707 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-9-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 8 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the prevention of sexual harassment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the prevention of sexual harassment

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-05-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-05-08HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-05-08SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-08SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence on roll call, requested by Senator Sirotkin, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2018-05-08SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2018-05-08SenateSenator(s) Balint motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-08SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-05-07Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-05-07SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to
2018-05-07SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as moved by Senator(s) Balint, Baruth, Clarkson, Sirotkin, and Soucy
2018-05-07SenateSenator(s) Balint, Baruth, Clarkson, Sirotkin, and Soucy motion to amend Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-07SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-07SenateReported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
2018-05-07SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Balint for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-05-07SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-05-07SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Balint, Baruth, Clarkson, Sirotkin, and Soucy
2018-05-07SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-07SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-05-05SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Balint, Baruth, Clarkson, Sirotkin, and Soucy
2018-05-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-05-05SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-05-04SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Balint, Baruth, Clarkson, Sirotkin, and Soucy
2018-05-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-05-04SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-04-27SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2018-04-27SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-04-27SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-16SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2018-03-14HousePassed
2018-03-14HouseRead Third time
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-03-13HouseReport of Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs agreed to.
2018-03-13HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 67 of 133 to Pass -- Yeas = 131, Nays = 2
2018-03-13HouseRep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs
2018-03-13HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-25HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback