VT H0701 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - House message: Governor approved bill on March 25, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - House message: Governor approved bill on March 25, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to cannabis license fees and the regulation of the medical cannabis registry
Title
An act relating to cannabis license fees and the regulation of the medical cannabis registry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Signed by Governor on March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-03-16 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-03-11 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-03-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment offered by Senator(s) Pearson and Sears |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Pearson and Sears |
2022-03-11 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-09 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-02-03 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-02-03 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-02-02 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-02-02 | House | Rep. Elder of Starksboro spoke for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-02-02 | House | Read Second time |
2022-02-02 | House | Action Calendar: Committee bill for second reading |
2022-02-01 | House | Notice Calendar: Committee bill for second reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on February 1, 2022 |
2022-01-28 | House | Read First Time |