VT H0694 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - House message: Governor approved bill on March 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - House message: Governor approved bill on March 8, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to captive insurance companies
Title
An act relating to captive insurance companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on March 8, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor on March 8, 2018 |
2018-02-16 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2018-02-15 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed |
2018-01-31 | House | Read Third time |
2018-01-30 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-01-30 | House | Rep. Baser of Bristol recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-30 | House | Rep. Myers of Essex reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-01-30 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2018-01-23 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |