VT H0693 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 3, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 3, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Honor and Remember Flag
Title
An act relating to the Honor and Remember Flag
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time & adopted in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Signed by Governor on May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-04-04 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-04-04 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-03-30 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & adopted in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senator Collamore proposal of amendment text |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Collamore |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-28 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-20 | House | Report of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to. |
2018-02-20 | House | Rep. Strong of Albany reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2018-02-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-23 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |