VT H0691 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to highway safety

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to highway safety

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-26 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 133, Nays = 7 (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-31SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-26HousePassed
2018-01-26HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 133, Nays = 7
2018-01-26HouseRead Third time
2018-01-26HouseRep. Gonzalez of Winooski asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2018-01-26HouseRep. Gonzalez of Winooski moved to amend the bill
2018-01-25HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-01-25HouseWhich was disagreed to
2018-01-25HouseRep. Van Wyck of Ferrisburgh moved to amend the bill
2018-01-25HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-01-25HouseRep. Haas of Rochester moved to amend the bill
2018-01-25HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester spoke for the committee on Transportation
2018-01-25HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-24HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on January 24, 2018

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback