VT H0661 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Baruth
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-06 - Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Baruth
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Exhumation Requirements And Notice
Title
An Act Relating To Exhumation Requirements And Notice
Sponsors
Rep. John Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Senate | Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Benning motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Benning |
2014-05-06 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2014-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-03-14 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Amendment of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to and Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-13 | House | Rep. Moran of Wardsboro reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2014-03-13 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-01-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |