VT H0660 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to establishing the Commission on Sentencing Disparities and Criminal Code Reclassification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to establishing the Commission on Sentencing Disparities and Criminal Code Reclassification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HouseSigned by Governor on May 21, 2018
2018-05-16HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
2018-05-07HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-05-07HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-05-04HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-05-04SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2018-05-04SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-05-04SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-05-03Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-05-03SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Judiciary, as amended, agreed to
2018-05-03SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-03SenateReported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
2018-05-03SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-03SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-03SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-03SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-05-02SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2018-05-02SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-05-02SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-04-27SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2018-04-27SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-27SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-16SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-14HouseRead Third time and Passed
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-03-13HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to
2018-03-13HouseReport of the Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-13HouseRep. Hooper of Montpelier recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2018-03-13HouseRep. Lalonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-03-13HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2018-01-18HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback