VT H0655 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Signed by Governor on February 25, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-27 - Signed by Governor on February 25, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Fiscal Year 2014 Budget Adjustments
Title
An Act Relating To Fiscal Year 2014 Budget Adjustments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - Senate - Shall the bill be read the third time? (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 110 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | House | Signed by Governor on February 25, 2014 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-02-12 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-02-06 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-02-05 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 2 |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations |
2014-02-05 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-24 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 110, Nays = 33 |
2014-01-24 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-01-24 | House | Rep. Ellis of Waterbury moved to amend the bill which was agreed to |
2014-01-24 | House | Rep. Heath of Westford moved to amend the bill which was agreed to |
2014-01-23 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-01-23 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell moved to amend the bill which was disagreed to |
2014-01-23 | House | Rep. Heath of Westford spoke for the committee on Appropriations |
2014-01-23 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-01-21 | House | Committee Bill read first time |