VT H0638 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to increasing the number of examiners on the Board of Bar Examiners from nine to 11 members

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to increasing the number of examiners on the Board of Bar Examiners from nine to 11 members

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-28HouseRead Third time and Passed
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-02-27HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary agreed to.
2018-02-27HouseRep. Hooper of Montpelier recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2018-02-27HouseRep. Lalonde of South Burlington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-02-27HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2018-01-17HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback