VT H0629 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 3, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 3, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to access to adoption records
Title
An act relating to access to adoption records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Roll Call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 3, 2022 |
2022-05-03 | House | Signed by Governor on May 3, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-15 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-14 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-04-14 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-13 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-04-12 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 0 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Pearson motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2022-04-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-06 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-18 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-18 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-17 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2022-03-17 | House | Rep. Goslant of Northfield reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-17 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-17 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-11 | House | Rep. Goslant of Northfield moved to postpone action until March 17, 2022 which was agreed to |
2022-03-11 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-10 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-01-14 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |