VT H0628 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 6, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 6, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to amending a birth certificate to reflect gender identity
Title
An act relating to amending a birth certificate to reflect gender identity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-07 | House | Signed by Governor on April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 5, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ram Hinsdale for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-22 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2022-02-16 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-02-15 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to |
2022-02-15 | House | Rep. Small of Winooski reported for the Committee on Human Services |
2022-02-15 | House | Read Second time |
2022-02-15 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-02-11 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-01-13 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |