VT H0620 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to State-owned airports and economic development

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to State-owned airports and economic development

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on April 25, 2018
2018-04-25HouseSigned by Governor on April 25, 2018
2018-04-03HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2018-03-30SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence
2018-03-30SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-29SenateReported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Transportation, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2018-03-29SenateFavorable report by Committee on Transportation
2018-03-29SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-28SenateFavorable report by Committee on Transportation
2018-03-28SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-03-16SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation
2018-03-14HouseRead Third time and Passed
2018-03-13HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-03-13HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to
2018-03-13HouseReport of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations
2018-03-13HouseRep. Dakin of Colchester recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2018-03-13HouseRep. Kimbell of Woodstock reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2018-03-13HouseRead Second Time
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2018-01-16HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback