VT H0616 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to thermal efficiency monies and biomass-led district heat
Title
An act relating to thermal efficiency monies and biomass-led district heat
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2018-05-04 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-04-17 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor on April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2018-03-30 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed |
2018-02-13 | House | Read Third time |
2018-02-09 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-09 | House | Report of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to. |
2018-02-09 | House | Rep. Yantachka of Charlotte reported for the committee on Energy and Technology |
2018-02-09 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-12 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology |