VT H0611 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to compensation for victims of crime

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to compensation for victims of crime

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on April 19, 2018
2018-04-19HouseSigned by Governor on April 19,2018
2018-04-06SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2018-04-05HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-04-05HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-04-04HouseRep. Morris of Bennington moved to postpone action until Thursday, April 5, 2018 which was agreed to
2018-03-30HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-03-29SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-03-29SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-03-28Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-03-28SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-03-28SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-28SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-03-27SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-03-27SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-02-02SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-01-31HouseRead Third time and Passed
2018-01-30HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-01-30HouseRep. Morris of Bennington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-01-30HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-11HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback