VT H0606 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-31 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to regulating storage units

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to regulating storage units

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-31SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2020-01-29HouseRead Third time and Passed
2020-01-28HouseThird Reading Ordered
2020-01-28HouseReport of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to.
2020-01-28HouseRep. Morris of Springfield reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2020-01-28HouseRead Second Time
2020-01-07HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback