VT H0603 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to human trafficking

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to human trafficking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
2018-05-21HouseSigned by Governor on May 21, 2018
2018-05-16HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
2018-04-26SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2018-04-24HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-04-24HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-04-19HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-18SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-04-18SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-04-17Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-04-17SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2018-04-17SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-04-13SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-02-09SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2018-02-07HouseRead Third time and Passed
2018-02-06HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-02-06HouseRep. Morris of Bennington reported for the committee on Judiciary
2018-02-06HouseRead Second Time
2018-01-11HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback